Financial history MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520227
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £158.54k £64.01k £100.68k £173.98k £170.85k
Total expenditure £136.98k £113.79k £88.97k £138.31k £175.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.10k £22.67k £34.17k £5.33k £500