OPEN WORD UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Her Audio Bible UK exists for the advancement of the Christian religion, through creating an Audio Bible voiced by women across the UK, in order to represent a diversity of voices and reach a diversity of listeners. It exists for the benefit of, but not exclusively, women of faith, or faith curious in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Jane Partridge | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Caroline Houston | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER RICHARD VIVIAN HOUSTON FCA MSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE RESOURCES OF RELIGIOUS CONTENT, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON AN AUDIO BIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Rose Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 6TE
- Phone:
- 07788494496
- Email:
- openworduk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window