SHOREHAM AND ADUR COMMUNITY FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the prevention and relief of poverty in Shoreham and Adur, West Sussex, providing the services via a foodbank to those in need. To do this we collect food and financial donations from organisations and individuals. All our work is undertaken by volunteers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,795 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jocelyn Caroline Loader | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Alex Robertson | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Ricketts | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Nisbet | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Peter Earle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHRISTOPHER BEHLING | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.88k | £32.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £29.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.70k | £2.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SHOREHAM AND ADUR, WEST SUSSEX, THROUGH PROVIDING THE SERVICES OF A FOODBANK TO RESIDENTS IN NEED. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOREHAM FREE CHURCH
GORDON ROAD
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
BN43 6WF
- Phone:
- 07591076738
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window