Financial history GLOBE HALL

Charity number: 520326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.50k £18.87k £8.07k £6.48k £7.02k
Total expenditure £4.24k £8.12k £14.82k £5.40k £7.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £17.30k N/A N/A N/A