THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH AND ST MARY MAGDALENE MUNSTER SQUARE

Charity Number: 1199958
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Furthering the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the parish of Christ Church and St Mary Magdalene, Munster Square

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £59,850
Total expenditure: £163,900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 August 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARY MAGDALENE MUNSTER SQUARE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sally Jones Chair 05 November 2018
None on record
Julie Patricia Nicholls Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Prof Sarah Lois Price Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Mark Omorogbe Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Joanne Brewer Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £59.85k
Total expenditure £163.90k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 March 2025 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 March 2025 151 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Redhill Street
LONDON
NW1 4DQ
Phone:
07842341748