THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CLEMENT, SANDWICH

Charity Number: 1201047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £319,852
Total expenditure: £207,392

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARISH OF SANDWICH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sebastian John Hamilton Chair 17 September 2023
SANDWICH COMMUNITY HUB: THE JUBILEE CENTRE
Received: On time
Dawn Baxter-Phillips Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Stephen Michael Kirkpatrick Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
Valerie Oates Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
Diane Elizabeth Coller Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
Derek Barry Kirkaldie Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
Kevin Maurice Wright Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
Howard Arthur Evans Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £319.85k
Total expenditure £207.39k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Clements Hall
Church Street
St. Clements
SANDWICH
CT13 9EH
Phone:
02030894745