FARNHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. To help people find Christ and grow as His disciples.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 13 October 2022: CIO registration
- 16 September 2024: Funds received from 1126264 FARNHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Peter CULVER | Chair | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Barnardo | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Frood | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Caesar Posner | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin John Veness | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANDREW BURCH | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Grant | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Hughes | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GLEN BIRD B.A.HONS | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farnham Baptist Church
The Hart
FARNHAM
GU9 7HA
- Phone:
- 01252726830
- Email:
- office@farnhambaptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window