Financial history DRONFIELD DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 520654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £2.40k £12.56k £7.69k £3.61k
Total expenditure £6.04k £2.20k £13.12k £9.19k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.50k N/A N/A