Financial history 3RD SANDIACRE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.09k £17.41k £21.48k £28.72k £20.76k
Total expenditure £21.40k £8.60k £11.81k £25.84k £23.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A