SWANSEA FOODBANK

Charity Number: 1202604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Swansea Foodbank provides emergency food to people referred to us by our partner agencies. We rely on the generosity of local people to donate food and to give up their time to volunteer. We operate from locations around Swansea including West Cross, Clydach, Danygraig, Gorseinon, Mayhill, Penlan and Uplands. We offer Welfare Benefits advice to ensure people receive all they are entitled to.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £265,631
Total expenditure: £128,658

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Swansea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gloria Hughes Chair 03 April 2023
None on record
Alan Cram Trustee 09 December 2024
FRIENDS OF EDUCATION TANZANIA
Recently registered
HESHIMA
Received: On time
SWANSEA & GOWER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TY CROESO, CLYDACH
Received: On time
Peter Edward Hurst Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Philip Davies Trustee 03 April 2023
The Parish of Casllwchwr and Gorseinon
Received: 117 days late
LLWCHWR MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Rev Dr Adrian Morgan Trustee 03 April 2023
LLWCHWR MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
The Parish of Casllwchwr and Gorseinon
Received: 117 days late
Christopher John Davies Trustee 03 April 2023
RIVERSIDE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Received: 13 days late
Julie Rees Trustee 03 April 2023
RIVERSIDE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Received: 13 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2024
Total gross income £265.63k
Total expenditure £128.66k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 12 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Catherine's Church
Alexandra Road
Gorseinon
SWANSEA
SA4 4NU
Phone:
07815534095