Trustees SUNDERLAND VOLUNTARY SECTOR ALLIANCE
Charity Number: 1202811

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Reid | Chair | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Everett | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Spuhler OBE | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cornish | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Gordon | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ann Copley | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Cook | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Duggan | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MARTIN MELIA | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Cooper | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.