THE POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating a Community Centre since 1960, known as The Poppleton Centre, together with associated sports facilities, at Main Street, Upper Poppleton, York YO26 6JT for use by the residents of Upper Poppleton, Nether Poppleton and the surround. The Trust is also responsible for Poppleton Football Club based at Poppleton Community Football Pavilion at Millfield Lane, Upper Poppleton YO26 6LY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Robin Tomlinson | Chair | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Peacock | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Dixon | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Bowers | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Dean Bowers | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Starling | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Crome | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Heslin Lawson | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Wood | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Allen John Jones | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF UPPER AND NETHER POPPLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, GENDER, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
POPPLETON COMMUNITY CENTRE
MAIN STREET
UPPER POPPLETON
YORK
YO26 6JT
- Phone:
- 01904797478
- Email:
- info@poppletoncentre.org.uk
- Website:
-
poppletoncentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window