BISHOPSWOOD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities within a Village Hall for Bishopswood and the surrounding neighbourhood; in particular for the use of meetings, lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation. with the aim of improving the quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 20 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Peter Hoskins | Chair | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gill | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Louise Field | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Field | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mercedes Belinda Rebati | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Liddle | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Board | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr David Barrington Pimblett | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.57k | £30.75k | £32.60k | £31.92k | £40.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.39k | £22.42k | £42.39k | £28.70k | £37.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.23k | £3.17k | £150 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
BISHOPSWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAZELWOOD LODGE
KERNE BRIDGE
ROSS-ON-WYE
HR9 5QT
- Phone:
- 07890661094
- Email:
- admin@bvhonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window