Financial history STOKE PRIOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 520986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.07k £10.15k £12.79k £5.33k £6.78k
Total expenditure £3.16k £2.11k £7.53k £5.67k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.67k N/A N/A