Trustees STOKE PRIOR VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 520986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Peter Wyldes | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Banks | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Poole | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Arnold | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hayward | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Hayward | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Burt | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.