Financial history THE LANCASHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 521363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £65.74k £70.92k £67.77k £67.77k £87.78k
Total expenditure £66.42k £64.75k £47.67k £47.67k £76.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.58k £20.49k N/A N/A