Financial history HINCKLEY UNIT 401 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.01k £24.99k £13.80k £24.98k £15.45k
Total expenditure £18.36k £18.70k £12.88k £29.89k £23.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A