NEW LEAF LEARNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Leaf Learning is a registered charity (1202923), driven by the desire to improve outcomes for primary school aged children in Northamptonshire. We offer a nature-based, connection-focussed provision for children who are not currently engaging in learning in mainstream schools. We guide parents/carers and school staff in how to create safe spaces so that children can thrive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 03 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Hereward Wake | Chair | 03 May 2023 |
|
|||||
His Honour Judge Rupert Charles Mayo | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Louisa Ann Fowler | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Currell | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PRIMARY SCHOOL-AGED CHILDREN WITH LEARNING DIFFERENCES BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING OUTDOOR-BASED EDUCATION AND RESOURCES FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL-AGED CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Courteenhall Farms
The Estate Office
Courteenhall
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 2QD
- Phone:
- 07510075644
- Email:
- info@newleafl.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window