Accounts and annual returns 1ST FLEETWOOD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2024 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 November 2024 640 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 March 2022 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2022 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 March 2022 408 days late Download Open in new window