FURNLEY HOUSE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1203690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide grants and donations for such charitable purposes, for the public benefit, that are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England and Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,899
Total expenditure: £13,317

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON WINFIELD Chair 08 April 2023
Steps Conductive Education Centre
Received: On time
LEICESTER RIDERS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Kathryn Joy Haines Trustee 08 April 2023
LEICESTERSHIRE ACTION FOR MENTAL HEALTH PROJECT
Received: On time
Paul Hollinshead Trustee 08 April 2023
None on record
Charlotte Lynch Trustee 08 April 2023
None on record
Stefan Fura Trustee 08 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.90k
Total expenditure £13.32k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FURNLEY HOUSE LTD
340 MELTON ROAD
LEICESTER
LE4 7SL
Phone:
07811184842