THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sisters serve people of all cultures, religions and creeds with particular emphasis on those who are vulnerable in any way or suffering from poverty and injustice. Such as, Worship and Prayer, Social and Pastoral Work, Caring for Members of the Congregation, Overseas Missionary Work
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Kathleen Kennedy | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Theresa Tighe | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Anne Teresa Redmond | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Kathleen Anne Harte | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Sarah Margaret King-Turner | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Mary Teresa O'Neill | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sister Maureen Anne Tinkler | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PROVINCE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT: 3.1.1 THE CIO'S PROPERTY AND THE INCOME THEREOF SHALL NOT BE APPLICABLE TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PROVINCE WHICH THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL CONSIDER SHOULD BE ADVANCED BY THE USE OF OTHER ASSETS; AND 3.1.2 IF AT ANY TIME THE COMMUNITY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK IN THE PROVINCE THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3.2 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROVINCIAL HOUSE
THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
NW7 1RE
- Phone:
- 02089063777
- Email:
- secretariat@dcmillhill.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.