BWG SWANSEA CAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BWG Swansea CAP provides debt advice in partnership with the national charity Christians against poverty, which can be accessed through the national phoneline or website. It is planning to hold Money Coaching courses to help people learn budgetting and personal financial management. It works in the Swansea area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 30 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND JOHN ARTHUR SANDFORD EVANS | Chair | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
John Edward Davies | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Paul Anthony Scott | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew James Knight | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.62k | £29.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.76k | £20.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.08k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS LIVING IN AND AROUND SWANSEA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN AND AROUND SWANSEA IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH CARE, COMPASSION AND RELEVANT PRACTICAL AND SPIRITUAL HELP AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 Frampton Road
Gorseinon
SWANSEA
SA4 4YE
- Phone:
- 01792736159
- Email:
- ANDREW.KNIGHT@MYYAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window