THE JOINT CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL BENEFICE OF HOLY TRINITY MALVERN AND WEST MALVERN

Charity number: 1205276
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Church of England Joint Church Council carrying out religious activities in Malvern.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 2023: Standard registration
  • 06 February 2025: Funds received from 1133520 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JCC of Holy Trinity and West Malvern (Working name)
  • THE JOINT COUNCIL OF MALVERN HOLY TRINITY AND ST JAMES' (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rebecca Caroline Elliott Chair 23 April 2023
None on record
Helen Ruth Catherine Brice Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
Elaine Shaw Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
Mary Christine Lawrence Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Victoria Elizabeth McCulloch Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Valerie Joyce Willcox Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Sarah Brierley Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Janine Emily Summers Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Elaine Susan Bevan Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Charles Pavey Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Sally Elizabeth Colbourne Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Catherine Millar Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
William James Colbourne Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
GILLIAN HARMER Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Jeremy Patrick Ide Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
DAVID GORDON MATTHEWS Trustee 16 April 2023
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JAMES'S, WEST MALVERN
Received: On time
Ian Andrew Brazier Trustee 16 April 2023
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JAMES'S, WEST MALVERN
Received: On time
Nicholas Brown Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
2 NORTH MALVERN ROAD
MALVERN
WR14 4LR
Phone:
01684573559