FRIENDS OF TESTON CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain, repair, restore, preserve, improve, beautify and reconstruct for the benefit of the public the fabric of the Parish Church of Saint Peter and Saint Paul in Teston, its monuments, fixtures, fittings, furniture, stained glass, ornaments and other chattels and its churchyard, including the walls, fencing, lychgate, hedges, trees, grass and other landscaping thereof.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 26 July 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maurice Chittenden | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Peter John Broadley | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Jane Corby | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dennis Astridge | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN DOUGLASS | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
NINA MAY WHEAT | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
PETER RONALD COULLING | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL IN TESTON, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD, INCLUDING THE WALLS, FENCING, LYCHGATE, HEDGES, TREES, GRASS AND OTHER LANDSCAPING THEREOF.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GABLES
CHURCH STREET
TESTON
MAIDSTONE
ME18 5AG
- Phone:
- 01622813143
- Email:
- petercoulling@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.