1ST APPLEBY MAGNA WITH MEASHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of the Scouting Programme to children in the local area
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 September 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Ford | Chair | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mayles | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Cribb | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mitchell | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Scout Hut
Measham Road
Appleby Magna
Swadlincote
DE12 7BN
- Phone:
- 01530637007
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.