TOTAL INTIMACY MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 12 December 2023: CIO registration
- TOTAL INTIMACY (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Bamisile | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joshua Adebowale | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ADEDIRAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Daniel Owusu | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IFEOLUWA JAIYESIMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT MILTON KEYNES, AND THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PASTORAL AND OUTREACH WORK FOR THOSE IN CHARITABLE NEED IN THE COMMUNITY, BUILDING A COMMUNITY OF INTEGROUS FAITH LEADERS WHO CAN STAND AS PILLARS WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND UNITED KINGDOM, ADVOCATING FOR AND UPHOLDING THE RIGHTS AND BELIEFS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND BY OTHER SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 LEYBURN COURT
HEELANDS
MILTON KEYNES
2 Leyburn Court Heelands
MK13 7RA
- Phone:
- 07535780250
- Email:
- admin@totalintimacy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window