Financial history LONG LAWFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.13k £12.51k £20.90k £12.05k £11.99k
Total expenditure £6.86k £12.08k £8.82k £22.07k £11.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £320
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.05k £2.67k N/A