Financial history BENTLEY SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523492
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.78k £18.98k £37.92k £57.11k £52.82k
Total expenditure £34.55k £19.84k £22.10k £54.45k £55.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.12k N/A N/A