Financial history THE OULTON INSTITUTE

Charity number: 523794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £255.10k £60.42k £60.66k £68.26k £132.69k
Total expenditure £296.17k £72.07k £37.78k £55.34k £164.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.05k N/A N/A N/A