Trustees THE OULTON INSTITUTE
Charity number: 523794

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET PENISTON | Chair | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Elizabeth Ball | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ball | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Stuart David Ward | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Rebecca Harvey | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hope | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH TONKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RON WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT HOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.