Trustees WALSDEN CRICKET GROUND
Charity number: 523976

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY GREENWOOD Cllr | Chair | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr David Paul Hancock | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Ben Jancovich | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tyler Hanley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Press | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Rachel Rea | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
May Molteno | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Jayne Thorpe | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Pat Ripley | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kenneth James White | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Patricia Williams | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Steve Martin | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Kent | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Carrigan Cllr | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Denis Skelton | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Anthony Hollis Cllr | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.