THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOCKBURN IN THE DIOCESE OF DURHAM

Charity number: 1210219
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

All Saints' Church, Girsby, in the parish of Sockburn, is a parish church in the Diocese of Durham serving the local parish, diocese and beyond through public worship, teaching, pastoral work and outreach.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS CHURCH, GIRSBY (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalind Tweddle Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Elizabeth May Robinson Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
David Deacon Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
William Robert Alderson Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Rev Anthony Smith Trustee 06 August 2023
None on record
JANE ALDERSON Trustee 12 April 2011
WORSALL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
George Allen Harrison Trustee 20 April 2005
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
GARTHORNE FARM
ARCHDEACON NEWTON
DARLINGTON
DL2 2YB
Phone:
01325262122