Financial history CONNAH'S QUAY UNIT 91 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 524082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.60k £10.72k £11.26k £49.63k £9.11k
Total expenditure £8.07k £4.37k £9.25k £51.25k £8.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A