Trustees CONNAH'S QUAY UNIT 91 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 524082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eric Eustace Chair 13 May 2024
None on record
Stuart Brown Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Juliette Littleton Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
Gillian Faulkner Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
ERIC STUART FAULKNER Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
PETER DARCY Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record