Financial history NEUADD BENTREF LLANUWCHLLYN

Charity number: 524294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.92k £26.51k £34.22k £32.60k £16.57k
Total expenditure £7.60k £16.58k £12.15k £59.89k £13.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £23.75k £10.37k £21.75k £750