ST NICHOLAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saint Nicholas Village Hall Committee maintains the Village Hall and its facilities and hosts cultural, social and fundraising events for our area of benefit in north Pembrokeshire generally and in Pencaer in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,707 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 14 April 1966: Standard registration
- PWYLLGOR NEUADD Y PENTREF TREMARCHOG (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Karen Roden | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PERKINS | Trustee | 23 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64k | £12.04k | £501 | £4.10k | £13.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £3.18k | £3.35k | £5.85k | £23.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £9.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 21ST MAY 1964 AND TRUST DEED DATED 29TH OCTOBER 1965.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST. NICHOLAS GRANSTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. NICHOLAS VILLAGE HALL
ST. NICHOLAS
GOODWICK
SA64 0LG
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window