STOKE-ON-TRENT NORTH, STOKE-ON-TRENT SOUTH, NEWCASTLE AND LONGTON DIVISIONS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 524532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Guide Association, as part of a worldwide Movement, enables girls and young women to fufil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society through its distinctive, stimulating and enjoyable programme of activities delivered by trained volunteers. This charity owns and provides a Brownie and Guide Holiday House and a Brownie and Guide Campsite for use by all members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £36,652
Total expenditure: £33,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COPELAND COTTAGE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
  • STOKE-ON-TRENT, NEWCASTLE AND LONGTON DIVISION OF GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Marie Miller Chair 14 October 2024
None on record
Claire Lawrence Trustee 14 October 2024
STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
LONGTON DIVISION, GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
TRUDY JANE REALE Trustee 01 July 2022
NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DIVISION, GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Debra Kay Jolley Trustee 01 February 2022
STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Karen Jane Poyser Ms Trustee 21 December 2021
None on record
Elaine Kathleen Teggin Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.63k £37.25k £9.10k £25.77k £36.65k
Total expenditure £25.78k £15.92k £13.42k £26.97k £33.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.05k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
51 Victoria Park Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 6DX
Phone:
01782680690