Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION EAST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 524675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £65.38k £65.37k £72.40k £49.96k £58.96k
Total expenditure £64.55k £56.65k £64.93k £72.37k £86.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £34.86k N/A N/A