Trustees SAINT WERBURGH SPONDON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Charity number: 1209992
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Julian Francis Hollywell | Chair | 24 January 2008 |
|
|||||
Nicola Moore | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Woodhams | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Thornton | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Christian Alldread | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Dean | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Karen Moira Norton | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorian Krohl | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Dobson | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Eames | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Till | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LEWIS NORTON | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen Salter | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leah Kate Smedley | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANN LEATHERBARROW | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Mark Clewes | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Shirley Ann Donovan | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hanson | Trustee | 01 May 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.