Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION - SHEFFIELD COUNTY

Charity number: 524795
Charity reporting is up to date (145 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44.70k £28.71k £28.96k £34.08k £39.27k
Total expenditure £45.97k £50.04k £40.84k £53.78k £49.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A