Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION - SHEFFIELD COUNTY

Charity number: 524795
Charity reporting is up to date (145 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 18 May 2024
HAZELNUT COMMUNITY FARM
Received: On time
Rachael Claire Hollingsworth Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Alison Brown Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Heather Todd Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Judy Hulley Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Jemma Taylor Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record