THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN'S BATHFORD IN THE DIOCESE OF BATH & WELLS

Charity number: 1211013
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST SWITHUN'S BATHFORD PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lauretta Joy Wilson Chair
None on record
Rev Jane Elizabeth Hoe Trustee 01 July 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATHEASTON ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST. CATHERINE
Received: On time
BATHEASTON YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
Charlotte Anne Hart Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
JOHN HENRY KEELTY Trustee 09 May 2021
BATHFORD PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
JEREMY BRIAN FURBER Trustee 21 January 2021
ONE COMMUNITY TRUST KEYNSHAM
Received: On time
MICHAEL GEORGE GILBERT BSC FCA Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
MARK IVAN DIXON Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Robert Lloyd Wolsey Trustee
None on record
Gillian Alexandra Mary Gilbert Trustee
None on record
Stephen William Huard Trustee
None on record
Ann Kathryn Wade Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. SWITHUNS CHURCH
CHURCH STREET
BATHFORD
BATH
BA1 7RS
Phone:
01225920050