Trustees COVENTRY DIOCESAN EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1213053
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND JONATHAN NOEL JEE Chair 08 May 2024
ST PAUL'S PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, LEAMINGTON PRIORS
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
REVEREND ALISON JANE EVANS Trustee 11 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY ATTLEBOROUGH, NUNEATON
Received: 19 days late
PHILIP ALEXANDER SEWARDS Trustee 10 April 2024
THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
REVEREND DANIEL JAMES CORLETT Trustee 08 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS ALCESTER WARWICKSHIRE
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
ALAN WICKHAM Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
REVEREND REBECCA ANNE JONES Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
REVEREND ANDREW MARCH Trustee 06 March 2024
COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CHRISTOPHER'S, COVENTRY
Received: On time