Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S CONVENT

Charity number: 525535
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required