DOVER FOODBANK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in Dover and surrounding areas we help to alleviate poverty through the provision of food parcels to those in crisis, in partnership with local agencies who refer clients in crisis to us. As part of our service we signpost to other care agencies, advice services and support agencies to try and help alleviate the clients immediate crisis that is causing their need to use the Foodbank.
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 10 April 2025: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Judith Sian Shilling | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leslie Boxall | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Jonathan Grant Pryse | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Elizabeth Donaldson | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Elisabeth Jowett | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER HOLDEN WALLACE | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN DOVER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES, AND TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SUPPORTED BY CHURCHES IN DOVER AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOVER FOODBANK
UNIT 7 CHARLTON CENTRE
HIGH STREET
DOVER
CT16 1TT
CT16 1TT
- Phone:
- 07754178297
- Email:
- info@dover.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.