TERRA NOVA SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 525919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The School's aim as an educational charity for children is to benefit the public by providing first class education, independent of the State system. A day school, with boarding facilities, which aims for the highest quality of academic tuition and the development of sporting, artistic and social skills. The School also makes available its facilities to members of the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1963: Standard registration
  • 28 May 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TERRA NOVA SCHOOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Jayne Lees-Jones Chair 01 July 2019
PETTY POOL
Received: On time
Ben Atkins Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Lotte Tulloch Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Martin Andrew Boulton Trustee 01 January 2019
THE BLACKDEN TRUST
Received: On time
Anna Rebecca Peak Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Emily Sara Stanley Trustee 11 December 2017
None on record
Mark Jonathan Grice Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
Andrew Cameron Gilchrist-Dick Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.30m £3.52m £3.88m £3.44m £3.87m
Total expenditure £3.29m £3.61m £4.56m £3.88m £3.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £77.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.60k £39.55k £316 £20.42k £53.75k
Income - Other trading activities £3.17m £3.44m £3.86m £3.42m £3.81m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £53.75k
Income - Investment £3.13k £143 £564 £7.32k £12.73k
Income - Other £77.73k £39.96k £17.49k £332 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.52k £6.51k £4.55m £3.86m £3.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.28m £3.60m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £5.88k £16.34k £27.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £5.88k £16.34k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £1.89m £1.93m £1.87m £1.74m £1.67m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.54m £1.55m £997.20k £1.13m £1.82m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £866.55k £1.00m £1.02m £1.46m £2.08m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 April 2024 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 April 2024 297 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 1961
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF PENSIONS AT RETIREMENT FOR FOUR OF TERRA NOVA SCHOOL SENIOR MASTERS NAMELY:- CLIFTON ALEXANDER MACKENZIE, HEDLEY GRAFTON MOORE, RAYMOND U. UHNOFF KAUFMANN AND ALBAIN URLING SMITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 23 January 1963 : Standard registration
  • 28 May 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Terra Nova Preparatory School
Jodrell Bank
Holmes Chapel
CREWE
CW4 8BT
Phone:
01477571251