Financial history THE EPHRAIM HALLAM CHARITY

Charity number: 525975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.41k £13.57k £13.29k £15.85k £15.65k
Total expenditure £11.71k £12.57k £13.33k £14.22k £13.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A