Financial history THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF PHINEAS JACKSON

Charity number: 527494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £175 £904 £491 £633 £651
Total expenditure £494 £504 £540 £492 £648
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A