Financial history WILLIAM LOVELL'S FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.96k £14.93k £15.22k £15.62k £16.37k
Total expenditure £7.55k £7.72k £11.38k £10.69k £7.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A