Financial history EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 527774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.87k £3.88k £4.42k £4.42k £5.80k
Total expenditure £3.10k £1.45k £1.44k £1.02k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A